EP1629916 - Power tool with tool bit holder operator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choon Nang Electrical Appliance Mfy., Ltd. 11th Floor, Ha Lung Industrial Building, 52 Wong Chuk Hang Road Aberdeen Hong Kong SAR / CN | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lui, Tat Nin 11th Floor, Ha Lung I. Bldg. 52 Wong Chuk Hang Rd. Aberdeen Hong Kong / CN | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place GB-Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254320.4 | 11.07.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | HK20040105288 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: HK 04105288 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629916 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/06, B23B31/02 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B23B31/06 (EP,US);
B23B31/2012 (EP,US);
B23B2231/2081 (EP,US);
B23B2260/078 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17299 (EP,US);
Y10T279/3431 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrowerkzeug mit Werkzeughalter-Spannvorrichtung | [2006/09] | English: | Power tool with tool bit holder operator | [2006/09] | French: | Outil à moteur avec dispositif de serrage du porte-outil | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 02.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5167478 (RAMUNAS VALDAS S [US]) [X] 1,4,5,12* the whole document * |