EP1622051 - Method of displaying web document on consumer electronics device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cha, Soon-back 203-806 Maetan Seongil Apt. Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Brandon, Paul Laurence, et al APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254373.3 | 13.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | KR20040056427 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004056427 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622051 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1622051 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/048, G06F3/033, H04N5/445 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/033 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F16/955 (EP,US);
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | G06F17/30, G06F3/033, H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Netzdokument-Anzeigeverfahren auf einem Unterhaltungselektronikgerät | [2006/05] | English: | Method of displaying web document on consumer electronics device | [2006/05] | French: | Méthode d'affichage d'un document web sur un appareil d'électronique grand public | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/20] | 28.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9749044 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,15,16 * abstract * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 5, line 23 - line 33 * * page 6, paragraphs 2,4; figures 1-4 * * page 9 - page 10 * * page 12 * * page 27 - page 30 * * page 38 - page 39 *; | [X]WO9809243 (INTERNET MEDIA CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12,17,19 * abstract * * page 7 - page 8 * * page 10 - page 11 * * page 13 - page 14 *; | [A]US5818935 (MAA CHIA-YIU [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,3,7,8; claims 2,5-7 *; | [X]JPH11338878 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,12,17,19 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0018] , [0023]; figures 2,3,5; claims 11,12,14,15 *; | [A]WO0144914 (WORLDGATE SERVICE INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * pages 2-3 * * pages 6-7 * * page 14 *; | [A]US2002077143 (SHARIF IMRAN [US], et al) [A] 12-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0028] , [0030] - [0037] - [0060] - [0063]; figures 1-9,11; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1300780 (PACE MICRO TECH PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4-6,9-14,17-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0016] - [0021] - [0028]; figures 1-3; claims 1-3,6,9 *; | [A]GB2383510 (PACE MICRO TECH PLC [GB]) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** pages 1-6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003196174 (PIERRE COTE JOSEPH PAUL-EMILE [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0010] , [0011] , [0025] , [0029] , [0040]; figures 5b,6a,8 * |