EP1630892 - Separator and cell using the same for use in solid polymer electrolyte fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi, 485-8550 / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishioka, Yutaka c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8550 / JP | 02 /
Mihara, Yasuhiko c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8550 / JP | 03 /
Hirai, Ryo c/o Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi 485-8550 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
Ishioka, Yutaka Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi 485-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
Mihara, Yasuhiko Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi 485-8550 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirai, Ryo Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi 485-8550 / JP | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/37] |
Former [2006/09] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254658.7 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | JP20040221614 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004221614 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1630892 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1630892 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630892 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP,US);
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
H01M8/0254 (EP,US);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/0273 (EP,US);
H01M8/0284 (EP,US);
H01M8/0297 (EP);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Separator sowie damit versehene Festpolymerelektrolyt-Brennstoffzelle | [2006/09] | English: | Separator and cell using the same for use in solid polymer electrolyte fuel cell | [2006/09] | French: | Séparateur et pile à combustible à électrolyte polimérique solide l'utilisant | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2005 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1255315 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0052] - [0062] ** figure 5 *; | [X]US2002192532 (INAGAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] , [0041] * * figures 4-8 *; | [X]CA2496339 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * page 46, lines 2-19 *; | [X]US2004048135 (HARTNACK HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2002083610 | JP2004221614 |