|
07.02.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2011 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.10.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |