Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1621389
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.02.2012 |
Refusal of application |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
30.08.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
02.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.10.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
22.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
20.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
20.10.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
20.10.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
19.05.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
16.12.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |