EP1621389 - Electrical power system for vehicles requiring electrical power while the vehicle engine is not in operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACCAR INC 777 106th Avenue N.E. Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states PACCAR Inc 777 106th Avenue N.E. Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plummer, Lew 23315 Gunderson Road Mount Vernon, WA 98273 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Bretell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254688.4 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US20040899795 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: US 899795 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621389 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621389 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60L1/00, B60L1/02, B60H1/32 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
B60H1/00278 (EP,US);
B60H1/00378 (EP,US);
B60L1/02 (EP,US);
B60L58/25 (EP,US);
B60H1/00271 (EP,US);
B60L2210/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | B60L1/00, B60L1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Elektirsche Energieversorgungssystem für Fahrzeuge während Betriebspausen des Fahrzeugmotors | [2006/25] | English: | Electrical power system for vehicles requiring electrical power while the vehicle engine is not in operation | [2006/05] | French: | Système d'alimentation électrique pour véhicules pendant le moteur du véhicule non est opéré. | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/05] | Elektrisches Energieversorgungssystem für Fahrzeuge während Betriebspausen des Fahrzeugmotors | ||
Former [2006/05] | Système d'alimentation électrique pour véhicules pendant le moteur du véhicule non est opéré | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 27.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/11] | 28.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYA]US5039927 (CENTAFANTI ROCCO [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 67; figures 1-5 * * abstract * [Y] 5,6,9-14,21,25-27 [A] 8,22-24; | [X]JP2003197269 ; | [X]JPH07143609 ; | [Y]US4902956 (SLOAN JEFFREY M [US]) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,2 * * column 8, lines 1-39; figure 9 * * abstract *; | [A]US5089762 (SLOAN JEFFREY M [US]) [A] 5-7 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 68; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2003197489 (PRABHU SAMEER [US], et al) [Y] 9-11,20,21,25,26 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 13; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP0933245 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12-14,27 * page 6, paragraph 42 - page 8, paragraph 63; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2002026797 (SUNDHAR SHAAM P [US]) [Y] 20 * page 3, paragraph 44 - page 5, paragraph 116; figures 3,4 * * abstract *; | [A]US5901572 (PEIFFER LARRY [US], et al) [A] 20 * column 6, line 59 - column 8, line 4; figure 3 * * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003197269 A 20030711 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07143609 A 19950602 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5039927 |