EP1627934 - Method for producing thin films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/08] | Thin films and a method for producing the same | ||
[2007/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Takao, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yukinori, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Yoshimasa, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254697.5 | 27.07.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040235992 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004235992 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627934 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1627934 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627934 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C16/515 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C23C16/515 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, PL [2006/49] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dünnschichten | [2007/26] | English: | Method for producing thin films | [2007/26] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication de couches minces | [2007/26] |
Former [2006/08] | Dünnschichten und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [2006/08] | Thin films and a method for producing the same | ||
Former [2006/08] | Couches minces et méthode pour leur fabrication | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2007 | 26.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.11.2007 | PL | 21.11.2007 | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/25] | PL | 21.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH1112735 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [DX] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025]; figure 1 *; | [DX]JPH1112735 ; | [X]DE10055609 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 4,5 * paragraph [0011]; figure 3 *; | [YX]DE19513614 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 27 * * column 1, line 1 - line 8; example 1 * [X] 4,5; | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11012735 A 19990119 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [DX] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - HARTMANN P ET AL, "Deposition of thick diamond films by pulsed d.c. glow discharge CVD", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199605), vol. 5, no. 6-8, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 850 - 856, XP004080750 [Y] 1-3 * page 851, section 3.1, 3rd and 4th paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-9635(95)00369-X | Examination | - Handbook of Diamond like Carbon Films, NTS ISBN 4-86043-125-1 | - YOSHIKAWA M., Fundamentals of New Diamonds", KOGYO CHOSA KAI | - STAMATE E.; HOLZER N.; SUGAI H., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 86, pages 261501 - 261503 | by applicant | JPH1112735 | JP2003328137 |