EP1624682 - Recording control apparatus and method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohde, Junya c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Asazu, Hideki c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Souraku, Takehisa c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Tsuruta, Yasushi c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 05 /
Ozawa, Hiroyuki c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 06 /
Katsumoto, Toshiyuki c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 07 /
Sun, Wei c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254847.6 | 03.08.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | JP20040229200 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004229200 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624682 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624682 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/782 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H04N5/782 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/41] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungssteuergerät, Programm und Verfahren | [2006/06] | English: | Recording control apparatus and method, and program | [2006/06] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'enregistrement, procédé, et programme | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 09.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2010 | 14.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1058454 (GATEWAY INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 2-4,6,8; | [X]WO9749237 (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9-14 * abstract * * page 17, line 22 - line 31 *; | [X]US5956455 (HENNIG BRUNO EMANUEL [CH]) [X] 1,5,7,9-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - line 49 * * column 4, line 23 - line 34 *; | [Y]US2003200545 (NAKADA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 2-4,6,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]EP1292137 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * figure 2 * | [A] - STEVEN S. SKIENA, The Algorithm Design Manual, NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG NEW YORK, INC., (1998), ISBN 0-387-94860-0, XP002349431 [A] 1-14 * chapters 8.7.3, 8.7.4 and 8.7.8 * | Examination | EP0271664 | by applicant | EP1058454 | WO9749237 | US5956455 | EP0271664 |