EP1627619 - A steering means and quick release arrangement for a wheelchair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lesley, Samuel 26 Portway Steyning, West Sussex BN44 3QF / GB | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Gray, Peter John Bracey, et al Thompson Gray LLP Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Gray, Peter John Bracey, et al Thompson Gray LLP Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square Falmer Brighton BN1 9SB / GB | ||
Former [2006/08] | Gray, Peter John Bracey Intellectual Property Group Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square Falmer Brighton BN1 9SB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255069.6 | 16.08.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | GB20040018198 | 16.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0418198 | GB20040018199 | 16.08.2004 Original published format: GB 0418199 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627619 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1627619 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/02 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
A61G5/02 (EP);
A61G5/10 (EP);
A61G5/1051 (EP);
A61G5/1083 (EP);
A61G5/128 (EP);
A61G2200/20 (EP);
A61G5/101 (EP);
A61G5/1018 (EP);
A61G5/1027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung und schnell lösbare Vorrichtung für einen Rollstuhl | [2006/08] | English: | A steering means and quick release arrangement for a wheelchair | [2006/08] | French: | Moyen de direction et système de fixation rapide pour un fauteuil roulant | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/08] | Moyen de direction et sytème de fixation rapide pour un fauteuil roulant | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2368142 (MICHAEL KELL ALPHONSUS GERARD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3388926 (BARDSLEY GEORGE P, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2081075 (METABIO) [X] 1,2,4 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-4 * [A] 3; | [A]US4953645 (KOERBER HANS W [DE], et al) [A] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9423683 (PERMOBIL AB [SE], et al) [A] 3,5 * figure 2; claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]US5791672 (MASCLET CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 14* the whole document *; | [A]FR2846226 (MARTINOT ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 14 * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - SAMUEL LESLEY AND LUCY A. PORTER, "An ergonomic wheelchair for hemiplegics", TECHNOLOGY AND DISABILITY, (2000), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 183 - 189, XP008061826 [X] 1-29 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4241932 | - PORTER L A; LESLEY S, "An ergonomic one-handed wheelchair", PROCEEDINGS OF CWUAAT, (2001), pages 257 - 266 |