EP1717838 - Plasma tube array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinoda Plasma Corporation 11-3, Kanigasaka-azaoraibata Akashi-shi Hyogo 673-0012 / JP | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohe, Koji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Ishimoto, Manabu c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Awamoto, Kenji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Hitoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Tokai, Akira c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Yamazaki, Yosuke c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Hirakawa, Hitoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Shinohe, Koji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishimoto, Manabu c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Awamoto, Kenji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamada, Hitoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Tokai, Akira c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamazaki, Yosuke c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
07 /
Hirakawa, Hitoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al HASELTINE LAKE Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255097.7 | 18.08.2005 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050131487 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005131487 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717838 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717838 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717838 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49, H01J17/04 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
H01J11/24 (EP,US);
H01J11/18 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/42 (KR);
H01J2211/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | H01J17/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/43] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaröhrenarray | [2006/44] | English: | Plasma tube array | [2006/44] | French: | Réseau de tubes à plasma | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001028216 (TOKAI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2002063524 (NAKAMURA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0183]; figure 12 *; | [X]US2003214225 (YAMADA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0029] , [0053] - [0058]; figures 5b,5c * | by applicant | JPS61103187 | JP2003086141 | JP2003092085 | JP2003338244 |