EP1729266 - RFID tag and RFID tag managing system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Atsushi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yasui, Yutaka, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Hasebe, Takayuki, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al HASELTINE LAKE Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255245.2 | 25.08.2005 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | JP20050141480 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005141480 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1729266 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1729266 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/35765 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/08] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Verwaltung von RFID Etiketten | [2006/49] | English: | RFID tag and RFID tag managing system and method | [2006/49] | French: | Système et méthode pour la gestion d'etiquettes d'IDRF | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005061879 (HONDA HAJIME [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * abstract * * figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0262025 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |