EP1684321 - Photovoltaic device and lamp and display device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong-na, Heo c/o Samsung Advanced Inst. of Tech. San 14-1 Nongseo-ri, Giheung-eub Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeong-hee, Lee 713-1002 Tap Maeul Gyeongnam Apt., 525 Hatap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Tae-won, Jeong 512-1402, Saecheonnyun Greenville, Singal-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/01] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
Jeong-na, Heo c/o Samsung Advanced Inst. of Tech. San 14-1 Nongseo-ri, Giheung-eub Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Jeong-hee, Lee 713-1002 Tap Maeul Gyeongnam Apt., 525 Hatap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Tae-won, Jeong 512-1402, Saecheonnyun Greenville, Singal-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255252.8 | 25.08.2005 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | KR20040111108 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004111108 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684321 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684321 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/35, H01J63/00, H01J31/12 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H01J3/023 (EP,KR,US);
H01J1/35 (EP,KR,US);
H01J3/021 (EP,KR,US);
H01J63/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/14] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photovoltaisches Gerät und Lampe und Anzeigegerät mit dem photovoltaischen Gerät | [2010/01] | English: | Photovoltaic device and lamp and display device using the same | [2006/30] | French: | Appareil photovoltaique et Lampe et apparail d'affichage avec ce appareil photovoltaique | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/30] | Photovoltaisches Gerät und Lampe und Anzeigegerät mit dem photovoltaischem Gerät | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 22.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/35] | FR | 31.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1122759 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract * * page 4, paragraphs 20,21 * * page 6, paragraph 35 - page 7, paragraph 41 *; | [A]EP1253614 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 17 - page 4, paragraph 26 *; | [A]JP2004164855 ; | [A]EP0567297 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004164855 A 20040610 (KURA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4616248 |