EP1631030 - Apparatus and method for automatic frequency correction for an FSK receiver system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Laboratories Inc. 400 W. Cesar Chavez Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2010/09] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Integration Associates Inc. 110 Pioneer Way, Unit L Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegyi, Andras Vertanu u. 41 Szekesfehervar / HU | 02 /
Onody, Peter Pongrac koz 11 Budapest / HU | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255269.2 | 26.08.2005 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | US20040604975P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 604975 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631030 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631030 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/152, H03L7/18, H03J7/02 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
H04L27/1525 (EP,US);
H03D3/008 (EP,US);
H04L27/16 (EP,US);
H03J1/0008 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0028 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0057 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0065 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/45] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Frequenzkorrektur für ein FSK Empfangssystem | [2006/09] | English: | Apparatus and method for automatic frequency correction for an FSK receiver system | [2006/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de correction de fréquence automatique pour un système récepteur FSK | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | [2013/40] |
Former [2013/34] | GB | 26.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5530723 (MAPLESTONE DAVID B [GB]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 5 - column 6 *; | [X]US5548619 (HORIIKE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3 - column 4 * * figures 11,12 *; | [A]US6359942 (DUGGAN BERNARD C [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 1 - column 3 * |