EP1637028 - Lawn mower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plouraboue, Tommy Honda Europe Power Equip. R&D Rue des Chataigniers - pole 45 45140 Ormes Loire / FR | 02 /
Perotin, Cyril Honda Europe Power Equipment R&D Rue des Chataigniers - pole 45 45140 Ormes Loire / FR | 03 /
Vougier, Dominique Honda Europe Power Equip. R&D Rue des Chataigniers - pole 45 45140 Ormes Loire / FR | 04 /
Templier, Patrick Honda Europe Power Equip. R&D Rue des Chataigniers - pole 45 45140 Ormes Loire / FR | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hague, Alison Jane Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | Hague, Alison Jane Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255378.1 | 02.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | JP20040255833 | 02.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004255833 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637028 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1637028 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/81 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A01D43/063 (EP,US);
A01D34/81 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/48] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rasenmäher | [2006/12] | English: | Lawn mower | [2006/12] | French: | Tondeuse à gazon | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 23.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0074579 (WOLF GERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0895710 (DALOZ ETS [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1183937 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 13 - column 7, line 56; figures 1-7 * |