EP1635580 - Moving picture coding apparatus and moving picture coding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kenji 1199-8, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8022 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255416.9 | 05.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20040264418 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004264418 | JP20050255228 | 02.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005255228 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635580 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H04N19/152 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bewegtbildkodierung | [2006/11] | English: | Moving picture coding apparatus and moving picture coding method | [2006/11] | French: | Appareil et procédé de codage d'images animées | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |