EP1773040 - Audio conference buffering system with proximity detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256146.1 | 30.09.2005 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773040 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/56, H04M3/42, H04M1/656 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04M1/656 (EP);
H04M3/42221 (EP);
H04M3/56 (EP);
H04M1/605 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Audiokonferenzpufferungsystem mit Annäherungsdetektor | [2007/15] | English: | Audio conference buffering system with proximity detector | [2007/15] | French: | Système de stockage intermédiare d'audio conférence avec détecteur de proximité | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2007/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5712911 (HER JU-WON [KR]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [X]US2002176546 (DIETZ PAUL H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2004190700 (CUTAIA NICHOLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,13-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0039] * [Y] 3,4; | [A]US2004203677 (BROWN MICHAEL WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0228] - paragraph [0238] ** figures 25,38-41 * | by applicant | - BARRY ARONS, "SpeechSkimmer: A System for Interactively Skimming Recorded Speech", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER-HUMAN INTERACTION, (199703), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 3 - 38 |