EP1666238 - Apparatus and method for cleaning corrugated boards in a box finishing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN AUTOMATION, INC. 66 Loveton Circle Sparks, Maryland 21152 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips III, Daniel Cunnington 1208 Bluebird Court West Bel Air, MD 21015 / US | 02 /
Polikov, Yury 3434 Birch Hollow Road Pikesville, MD 21208 / US | 03 /
Weishew, Joseph John 1618 Pennsylvania Avenue Oreland, PA 19075 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
Phillips III, Daniel Cunnington 1208 Bluebird Court West Bel Air Maryland 21015 / US | ||
02 /
Polikov, Yury 3434 Birch Hollow Road Pikesville Maryland 21208 / US | |||
03 /
Weishew, Joseph John 1618 Pennsylvania Ave. Oreland Pennsylvania 19075 / US | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256183.4 | 04.10.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | US20040004718 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 4718 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1666238 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1666238 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1666238 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/74, B31B1/88, B31B1/04, B31B1/06 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B08B1/20 (EP,US);
B08B1/32 (US);
B08B1/34 (EP);
B08B15/02 (EP,US);
B08B6/00 (EP,US);
B31B50/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reinigen von Wellpappebögen in einer Zuschnittsbearbeitungsmaschine für Faltschachteln | [2006/23] | English: | Apparatus and method for cleaning corrugated boards in a box finishing machine | [2006/23] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour nettoyer des cartons ondulés dans une machine de fabrication de flans pour boîtes pliables | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | CY | 30.04.2008 | CZ | 30.04.2008 | DK | 30.04.2008 | EE | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | LT | 30.04.2008 | LV | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | PL | 30.04.2008 | RO | 30.04.2008 | SI | 30.04.2008 | SK | 30.04.2008 | TR | 30.04.2008 | BG | 30.07.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | IS | 30.08.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | IE | 04.10.2008 | LU | 04.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | HU | 01.11.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
TR | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 04.10.2008 | ||
LU | 04.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
HU | 01.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 04.10.2008 | ||
LU | 04.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
IE | 04.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
RO | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LT | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
IS | 30.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
LV | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
PL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 30.04.2008 | |
SI | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 30.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2659340 (ZINN JR JULIUS A); | [A]US4364147 (BIEDERMANN ERNST, et al); | [XA]US4715078 (HOWARD PAUL C [US], et al); | [X]US5008968 (PRESTON WALLACE [US]); | [DA]US6179763 (PHILLIPS III DANIEL CUNNINGTON [US]) |