EP1724907 - Linear motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Sun Yong 1405-409 Jugong Apt. 1088 Doksan-dong Keumchun-ku Seoul 153-010 / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Sang Sub 508-1006 Daedong Apt. Janghyun-dong Siheung-si Kyungki-do 429-420 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hyuk 105-301 Nulpurun Byuksan Apt. Daeya-dong Siheung-si Kyungki-do 429-010 / KR | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Viktor, Rainer Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Viktor, Rainer Vossius & Partner POB 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05256338.4 | 12.10.2005 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | KR20050041051 | 17.05.2005 Original published format: KR 2005041051 | KR20050042044 | 19.05.2005 Original published format: KR 2005042044 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724907 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724907 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/16, F04B35/04 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
H02K1/145 (EP,US);
H02K33/06 (US);
H02K33/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/30] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Linearmotor | [2006/47] | English: | Linear motor | [2006/47] | French: | Moteur linéaire | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004082103 (HOEGANAES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 10, line 30 - page 19, line 23 *; | [A]US4937481 (VITALE NICHOLAS G [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03081041 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1553294 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PA] 1-10 * abstract * |