EP1659714 - System and method for interactive monitoring of satellite radio use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems, Inc. 1110 American Parkway, NE Allentown, PA 18109 / US | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muth, Edwin A. 315 Arlene Terrace Aberdeen, New Jersey 07747 / US | 02 /
Song, Jie 709 Brookfield Circle Macungie, Pennsylvania 18062 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256690.8 | 28.10.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | US20040991002 | 17.11.2004 Original published format: US 991002 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659714 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1659714 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H9/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
H04H60/31 (EP,US);
H04H40/90 (EP,US);
H04H60/43 (EP,US);
H04H60/51 (EP,US);
H04H60/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur interaktiven Überwachung von Satellitenfunkbenutzung | [2006/21] | English: | System and method for interactive monitoring of satellite radio use | [2006/21] | French: | Système et méthode de surveillance interactive de l'utilisation de radio par satellite | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2012 | 31.10.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003216120 (CERESOLI CARL D [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0052] * * paragraph [0055] * [Y] 3,4 [I] 2,6; | [Y]US2003224759 (BURNETT ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [XI]US6678215 (TREYZ G VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 7,9 * column 1, lines 9-11,20-22,28-41,61-65 * * column 2, lines 22-35 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 3 * * column 6, lines 41-54 * * column 7, lines 10-15 * * column 8, lines 28-39 * * column 9, lines 20-23 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 14 * * column 12, lines 47-55 * * column 20, lines 24-49 * * column 26, lines 39-52 *[I] 8,10 | Examination | WO2004097803 |