EP1653437 - Image processing apparatus and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Cannon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Nobuhiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co., 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05256761.7 | 01.11.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | JP20040319495 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004319495 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653437 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1653437 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F3/14 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G09G2370/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/48] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2006/18] | English: | Image processing apparatus and image processing method | [2006/18] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de traitement d'informations d'images | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 25.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09269886 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * the whole document * * paragraphs [0096] - [0120]; figures 19-20 *; | [Y]EP1191450 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-17 * paragraphs [0050] - [0053]; figures 3-4 * * paragraphs [0083] - [0094]; figures 10-11 *; | [Y]US2003191738 (HOEYE ROBIN F [US], et al) [Y] 11-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-4; claims 1-34 *; | [Y]EP1455267 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0048]; figures 7-8; claims 1-17 * | by applicant | JPH09269886 | EP1191450 | US2003191738 | EP1455267 |