EP1662275 - System and method for security inspection using microwave imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [2017/51] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baharav, Izhak 251 Scripps Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Taber, Robert 328 Kipling Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
Lee, Gregory Steven 357 Anna Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
Kofol, John Stephan 729 Santa Rite Street Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | ||
Former [2011/50] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies SARL Rue de la Gare 29 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2006/22] | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257070.2 | 16.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | US20040996764 | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 996764 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1662275 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1662275 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662275 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/00, H01Q1/22, G01S13/88, H01Q21/06, G01S13/89 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2216 (EP,US);
G01S13/887 (EP,US);
G01S13/89 (EP,US);
G01V8/005 (EP,US);
H01Q21/065 (EP,US);
H01Q3/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | G01V8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/51] |
Former [2009/13] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Sicherheitsüberprüfung mittels Mikrowellenbildgebung | [2006/22] | English: | System and method for security inspection using microwave imaging | [2006/22] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'inspection de la sécurité au moyen d'une imagerie à micro-ondes | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 17.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2034554 (EMI LTD) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 80 - line 83 * * page 2, line 83 - line 91 *; | [Y]US4910523 (HUGUENIN RICHARD G [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 47 - line 50 *; | [Y]US5455590 (COLLINS H DALE [US], et al) [Y] 1,6 * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 9 * * column 17, line 11 - line 23 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US2004080448 (LOVBERG JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004140924 (KELLER PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * |