EP1659295 - Accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Hannifin PLC 6 Greycaine Road Watford Hertfordshire WD24 7QA / GB | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindgren, Andrew 61 Willow Bank Walk Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 3UT / GB | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257117.1 | 18.11.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | GB20040025428 | 18.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0425428 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659295 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/24 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
F15B1/24 (EP);
F15B2201/205 (EP);
F15B2201/312 (EP);
F15B2201/32 (EP);
F15B2201/4155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Druckspeicher | [2006/21] | English: | Accumulator | [2006/21] | French: | Accumulateur | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9836174 (HYDROLL OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9; | [X]DE9416577U (HYDAC TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH09144701 ; | [X]JPS4842416 (MOKOTO) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [AY]US4973027 (CASAS ALAIN R [FR]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 13; figure 5 * [Y] 7-9; | [A]GB1285405 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004067968 (HYDAC TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US5016909 (LIN CHIEN-HUNG [TW]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09144701 A 19970603 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |