EP1661585 - Method of preventing the development of biocide resistant bacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cleenol Group Ltd Beaumont Road Banbury Oxfordshire OX16 1RB / GB | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greaves, Richard Stephen Upper Court Mill End Chadlington Nr. Chipping Norton Oxfordshire OX7 3NY / GB | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Baldock, Sharon Claire BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257161.9 | 21.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | GB20040025656 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0425656 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661585 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, A61L2/16 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61L2/18 (EP);
A01N25/02 (GB);
A61L2/0088 (GB);
A61L2/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | Methode zur Verhinderung der Bildung von biozidresistenten Bakterien | [2006/22] | English: | Method of preventing the development of biocide resistant bacteria | [2006/22] | French: | Méthode d'empêcher le développement des bactéries résistantes de biocide | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/03] | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04250172 ; | [X]FR1368866 ; | [X]FR2233074 (HURKA WILHELM [AT]); | [X]US4418055 (ANDERSEN HAROLD W [US], et al); | [X]US5767055 (CHOY CLEMENT K [US], et al); | [Y]DE19737315 (WIDULLE HERBERT DIPL CHEM DR [DE]); | [X]FR2835187 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al); |