EP1671802 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing printed thermosensitive adhesive labels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Masanori, Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257222.9 | 23.11.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | JP20040363124 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004363124 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671802 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1671802 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J15/00, B41J3/407, B41J15/04, B65C9/25 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
B65C9/25 (EP,US);
B41J15/046 (EP,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0081 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1085 (EP,US);
Y10T156/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/09] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von bedruckten wärmeempfindlichen Haftetiketten | [2006/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing printed thermosensitive adhesive labels | [2006/25] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de fabrication d'étiquettes adhésives thermosensibles imprimées | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2003189631 (HOSHINO MINORU [JP], et al) [DA] 1,4 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061]; figures 1,5 *; | JP2003316265 [ ]; | [A]US2004218961 (HOSHINO MINORU [JP], et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003316265 A 20031107 (SII P & S INC) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | US2003189631 |