EP1674551 - Flame retardant resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ihara, Toshiaki, c/o Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chem Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masaki, c/o Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chem Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsumura, Kazuyuki, Silicone-Electronics Material Res. Ctr. Shin-Etsu Chem Co. Ltd. 1-10 Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257493.6 | 06.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | JP20040374114 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004374114 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674551 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674551 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/14, C08L67/04, C08K3/00 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flammwidrige Harzzusammensetzung | [2006/26] | English: | Flame retardant resin composition | [2006/26] | French: | Composition de résine ignifuge | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2004190025 ; | [A]US2001020537 (UENO YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,14 * table 2, comparative example 3 *; | [DA]EP1389630 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-4,11,14 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004175831 ; | [DA]JPH08134455 ; | [A]US6444315 (BARFURTH DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0924166 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,14 * claims 1,5,6,15 *; | [A]US3936416 (BRADY DONNIE G) [A] 1,14 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]JPH0539394 ; | [DPA]EP1564243 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DPA] 1,5-7,10,14 * the whole document * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 51, Database accession no. 2004-529095, XP002378446 & JP2004190025 A 20040708 (TORAY IND INC) [DA] 1-4,14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 50, Database accession no. 2004-520613, XP002378447 & JP2004175831 A 20040624 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-4,14 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 31, Database accession no. 1996-306895, XP002378448 & JPH08134455 A 19960528 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [DA] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 12, Database accession no. 1993-096857, XP002378449 & JPH0539394 A 19930219 (SAKAI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract * |