EP1672966 - Plasma jet systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Daniel N. 8874 Woodbank Drive NE Bainbridge Island, CA 98110 / US | 02 /
Chase, Charles J. 14207 Dickens Street Sherman Oaks CA 91423 / US | 03 /
McClure, Paul D. 9112 Westwood Shores Drive Forth Worth TX 76179 / US | 04 /
Boyd, Robert R. 26011 Bellis Drive Santa Clarita CA 91355 / US | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257637.8 | 13.12.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | US20040018708 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 18708 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1672966 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1672966 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/54, // B64C23/00 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
B64C23/005 (EP,US);
B64C27/18 (EP,US);
F03H1/0062 (EP,US);
F03H1/0087 (EP,US);
H05H1/54 (EP,US);
B64C2230/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/25] | H05H1/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/03] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmastrahl-Vorrichtungen und Verfahren | [2006/25] | English: | Plasma jet systems and methods | [2006/25] | French: | Systèmes et procédés à jet de plasma | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1106531 (HAWKER SIDDELEY AVIATION LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4893470 (CHANG FRANKLIN R [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]US5425231 (BURTON RODNEY L [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,13,14,17-20 * column 2, lines 6-43; figures 1,2 * * column 3, lines 6-17 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 4; figure 5 *; | [A]US5758823 (GLEZER ARI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6523338 (KORNFELD GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,13,15,17-20 * column 6; figure 1 * * column 8, lines 25-44 * | Examination | US3183403 | DE10300728 | by applicant | US3183403 | US5425231 | US6523338 |