EP1686251 - Pedal position and/or pedal change rate for use in control of an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shahed, Syed M. 30131 Cartier Drive Rancho Palos Verdes CA 90275 / US | 02 /
Stewart, Gregory E. 4351 Arbutus Street Vancouver BC / CA | 03 /
Borrelli, Francesco 315 W. 15th Street Minneapolis MN 55403 / US | 04 /
Hampson, Gregory J. 141 Ruckytucks Road Stillwater NY 12170 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05257991.9 | 22.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | US20040025221 | 29.12.2004 Original published format: US 25221 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686251 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02B37/24, // F02D41/18 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
F02D41/005 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/1401 (EP,US);
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02D2200/602 (EP,US);
F02D41/182 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pedalstellung und/oder Änderungsrate des Pedals zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2006/31] | English: | Pedal position and/or pedal change rate for use in control of an engine | [2006/31] | French: | Position d'une pédale et/ou taux de variation de l'angle d'une pédale pour le contrôle du ralenti d'un moteur | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 03.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10219382 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0007] *; | [X]US2003213465 (FEHL GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]US2004112335 (MAKINO HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 3,6 * |