EP1677365 - Semiconductor light emitting diode having textured structure and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Samsung LED Co., Ltd. 314 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon Gyunggi-do 442-743 / KR | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwak, Joon-seop, 301-1101 Hyundai Apt. Sinyeongtong Banwol-ri Taean-eub Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jeong-wook 805-1001 Hyundai Seongwoo Apt. Pungdeokcheon 2-don Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05258008.1 | 22.12.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | KR20040117960 | 31.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004117960 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1677365 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1677365 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
H01L33/22 (EP,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,US);
H01L21/02642 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/43] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Halbleiterdiode mit einer texturierten Struktur und Herstellungsverfahren | [2006/27] | English: | Semiconductor light emitting diode having textured structure and method of manufacturing the same | [2006/27] | French: | Diode électroluminescente à semi-conducteur avec une structure texturée et procédé de fabrication | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 19.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003141512 (BRUDERL GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0035] - [0049]; figures 1,2A-E *; | [X]WO2004051758 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12,14 * abstract * * page 8, line 20 - page 16, line 27; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2004124427 (HSU JULIA WAN-PING [US], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0054] - [0062]; figures 7-10 *; | [A]US2004150001 (SHCHUKIN VITALY [DE], et al) [A] * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0020] , [0021] , [0055] - [0071] - [0136]; figures 9,10,7 *; | [PX]US2005205886 (MUROFUSHI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5,11,12,14* paragraphs [0040] , [0058] - [0084]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | - H. S. VENUGOPALAN, "Morphology of Nickel and Nickel/Gold Contacts to Gallium Nitride", J.VAC.SCI.TECHNOL., (199803), vol. A16, no. 2 |