EP1676537 - Surgical tool with cannulated rotary tip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Mitek, Inc. 249 Vanderbilt Avenue Norwood, MA 02062 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Depuy Mitek, Inc. 249 Vanderbilt Avenue Norwood, MA 02062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heneberry, Elizabeth 262 East Street Westwood Massachusetts 02090 / US | 02 /
Ranucci, Kevin J. 70 Lillian Ct. Warwick Rhode Island 02886 / US | 03 /
Brown, Jeremy Whitegates, Ridding Lane, Curbar Hope Valley, Derbyshire S32 3YS / GB | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/27] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05258078.4 | 28.12.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | US20040905350 | 29.12.2004 Original published format: US 905350 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676537 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/16, // A61M1/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/1633 (EP,US);
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1602 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Werkzeug mit einer drehbaren Spitze mit durchgehendem Kanal | [2006/27] | English: | Surgical tool with cannulated rotary tip | [2006/27] | French: | Instrument chirurgical ayant une extrémité tubulaire | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5123904 (SHIMOMURA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0621008 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,2,13 * abstract * [A] 14; | [A]US5489291 (WILEY ROY C [US]) [A] 1,14* abstract *; | [XA]DE10048575 (CORIPHARM MEDIZINPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 14; | [XY]US2003009172 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [Y] 13,14; | [XA]US2004006358 (WULFMAN EDWARD I [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0094] * [A] 14; | [YA]US2004243157 (CONNOR BRIAN G [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0114] , [0120] , [0121] * [A] 1,3-12,14 | Examination | US6312438 | US2004181251 |