EP1681560 - X-Ray Detection System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bede Scientific Instruments Limited Belmont Business Park Durham DH1 1TW / GB | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bowen, David Keith 30 Oakwood Grove CV34 5TD, Warwick / GB | 02 /
Feichtinger, Petra Ludwig Kasper Str 5270, Mauerkirchen / AT | 03 /
Wormington, Matthew 9354 S. Wiltshire Dr CO 80130, Littleton / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/29] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05270088.7 | 08.12.2005 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | US20050036592 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 36592 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681560 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
G01N23/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/13] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Röntgenstrahlendetektionssystem | [2006/29] | English: | X-Ray Detection System | [2006/29] | French: | Système de détection de rayons X | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.02.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003108152 (BOWEN DAVID KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0098]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US2004114706 (IKEDA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US4245244 (LIJEWSKI ROBERT R, et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 33 * |