EP1563829 - Zinc gluconate composition containing acicular particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemoine, Cyril 38, rue du Manoir 95380 Puiseaux-en-France / FR | 02 /
Beau, Nathalie 6, allée du Stade 95610 Eragny-sur-Oise / FR | 03 /
Prud' Homme, Estelle 16, rue de la Fontaine du But 75018 / FR | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290136.0 | 21.01.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | FR20040050230 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0450230 | [2005/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563829 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/365, A61K8/02, A61Q15/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C07C59/105 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | A61K7/32, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Zink Gluconat Zusammensetzung enthaltend nadelförmige Partikel | [2005/33] | English: | Zinc gluconate composition containing acicular particles | [2005/33] | French: | Composition de gluconate de zinc comprenant des particules sous forme aciculaire | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10328284 ; | [A]FR1181752 (KONINK IND MIJ VOORHEEN NOURY) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0768080 (OREAL [FR]) [AD] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO0199376 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [AD] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 09, Database accession no. 1999-099361, XP002293583 & JPH10328284 A 19981215 (LION CORP) [A] 1-45 * abstract * | [A] - P.W. ROLLER ET AL., "The Zinc Gluconate System", AUST. J. CHEM, (1976), vol. 29, pages 2395 - 2403, XP008048087 [A] 1-45 * the whole document * |