EP1689082 - A low noise lowpass filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohannaidh, Eoin 6, le Champ du Pont 38190 Laval / FR | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290233.5 | 02.02.2005 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689082 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1689082 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/12 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H03H11/1213 (EP,US);
H03H11/1252 (EP,US);
H03H11/1286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein rauscharmes Tiefpassfilter | [2006/32] | English: | A low noise lowpass filter | [2006/32] | French: | Filtre passe-bas à faible bruit | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.07.2008 | [2009/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0274784 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-4 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4524332 (GAY MICHAEL J [CH]) [A] 1-4 * figure 6 * |