EP1598997 - Routing in a communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preguica, Christophe 1 Ter rue de Londres Bâtiment B 91300 Massy / FR | 02 /
Rombeaut, Jean-Pierre 385, route de Mons 59600 Maubeuge / FR | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/47] | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 54, rue La Boétie 75411 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290412.5 | 23.02.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | FR20040050954 | 17.05.2004 Original published format: FR 0450954 | [2005/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598997 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598997 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H04W40/32 (EP,US);
H04L45/52 (EP,US);
H04W40/248 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | Wegleitung in einem Kommunikationsnetzwerk | [2005/47] | English: | Routing in a communications network | [2005/47] | French: | Routage au sein d'un réseau de communication | [2006/39] |
Former [2005/47] | Routage au sein d'un reseau de communication | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | IE | 21.03.2007 | LT | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | PL | 21.03.2007 | RO | 21.03.2007 | SI | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | ES | 02.07.2007 | IS | 21.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | HU | 22.09.2007 | [2010/39] |
Former [2009/45] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
LT | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
LT | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
LT | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
LT | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IE | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IS | 21.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
PL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0243335 (KENT RIDGE DIGITAL LABS [SG], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 16 * * page 8, lines 1-12 ** page 9, lines 8-24 *; | [Y]US2004003111 (MAEDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0071] , [0075] - [0078] - [0080] , [0087] - [0095] - [0102] , [0110] , [0111] , [0117] , [0123] *; | [Y]US2004081152 (THUBERT PASCAL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0032] * |