EP1582664 - Locking device with push-buttons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sure Interior Co. Ltd. 5-15-3 Kuwazu Higashi Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-city Osaka Prefecture / JP | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuda, Yoji 5-15-3 Kuwazu Higashi Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-City Osaka Prefecture / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Madeuf 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Madeuf-Viard, 56A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290686.4 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040095047 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004095047 | [2005/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582664 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582664 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B37/16 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
E05B37/16 (EP,GB,US);
E05B53/008 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5788 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung mit Drucktasten | [2005/40] | English: | Locking device with push-buttons | [2005/40] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage à boutons-poussoirs | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2696493 (FONTAINE SA [FR]); | [A]EP0785322 (UNITECHNIQUES S A [FR]); | [A]GB2343481 (WANG SONG MING [TW]); | [A]EP1074681 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE20204901U (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]) |