EP1589466 - Method and system for distributing medicaments to dependent people [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medissimo L'Espace Media, 3, place Gustave Eiffel, Le Technoparc 78306 Poissy Cedex / FR | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blochet, Caroline 39, rue de la République 78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290895.1 | 22.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | FR20040004342 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0404342 | [2005/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589466 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT, PT [2006/27] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Verteilen von Medikamenten an unselbständige Personen | [2005/43] | English: | Method and system for distributing medicaments to dependent people | [2005/43] | French: | Procédé et systeme de distribution de médicaments à des personnes dependantes | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 14.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 17.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/10] | 16.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0060449 (SCRIPTPRO LLC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph L * * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph L * * claims 1,6 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US6155485 (COUGHLIN MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 37 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]CA2291558 (AUTOMED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 15, paragraph L - page 18, paragraph L * * page 21, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 2 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3,7,18A,18B,23 *; | [A]WO03019332 (INFORMMED [US], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [X]US2003200726 (RAST RODGER H [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0120] * * claims 1-3,8 * * figures 1-3,7,8,13-15,17 * |