EP1600385 - Storage and applicator device for a fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Laforcade, Vincent 3, Allée des Bleuets 78120 Rambouillet / FR | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Charlotte L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Julio, Charlotte L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2005/48] | Schmit, Charlotte L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290916.5 | 26.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | FR20040051031 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: FR 0451031 | [2005/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600385 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/30, B65D75/52, A45D40/00 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B65D1/30 (EP);
B65D47/42 (EP);
B65D75/527 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungs- und Ausgabevorrichtung für flüssige Produkte | [2005/48] | English: | Storage and applicator device for a fluid | [2005/48] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement et d'application d'un produit fluide | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXAY]US3860348 (DOYLE EDWARD J) [DX] 1-6,8-12,15-20 * the whole document * [A] 13,14,22 [Y] 7,21; | [Y]GB2084455 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [Y] 7 * figure -; claim - *; | [YA]FR2610300 (VIENNOISERIE FINE [FR]) [Y] 21 * figure -; claim - * [A] 22; | [A]EP1382541 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]GB2292928 (BODTKER TORBEN [DK]) [A] 1,21,22 * abstract * |