EP1617335 - Method of programming a DMA controller in an on-chip system and the associated on-chip system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez, Albert 9a Hameau du Pibou 13320 Bouc Bel Air / FR | 02 /
Nicolai, Jean 9, Allée Paul Cézanne, L'aurelienne 13790 Chateauneuf Le Rouge / FR | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/03] | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291449.6 | 05.07.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | FR20040007763 | 12.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407763 | [2006/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617335 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G06F12/1081 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/38] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Programmierungsmethode eines DMA-Controllers in einem on-Chip System und dazügehörendes on-Chip System | [2006/03] | English: | Method of programming a DMA controller in an on-chip system and the associated on-chip system | [2006/03] | French: | Procédé de programmation d'un contrôleur de DMA dans un système sur puce et système sur puce associé | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 19.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5659798 (BLUMRICH MATTHIAS AUGUSTIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,11,12,15 * figures 3,11 * * column 4, line 59 - column 4, line 64 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 6 * * column 11, line 38 - column 11, line 43 * * column 12, line 1 - column 12, line 3 * * column 12, line 30 - column 12, line 40 * * column 12, line 47 - column 12, line 64 * * column 17, line 35 - column 17, line 44 * * column 22, line 2 - column 22, line 4 * | by applicant | - M.A. BLUMRICH, "Protected User-Level DMA for the Shrimp Network Interface", PROC OF THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, (199602), doi:doi:10.1109/HPCA.1996.501182, pages 154 - 165, XP010162056 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPCA.1996.501182 | - J. HEINLEIN, "Integration of Message Passing and Shared Memory in the Stanford Flash Multi-Processor", PROC. OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARCHITECTURAL SUPPORT FOR PROGRAMMING LANGUAGES AND OPERATING SYSTEMS, (1994), pages 38 - 50 |