EP1741613 - Interface Module between a Signal Box and a Signalling Unit with LEDs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Alcatel 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Bernd Gartenstrasse 21/6 71679 Asperg / DE | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05291458.7 | 04.07.2005 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741613 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741613 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/18, B61L7/10, H05B33/08 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B61L5/1881 (EP,US);
B61L7/10 (EP);
H05B45/34 (US);
H05B45/345 (EP,US);
B61L2207/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Schaltmodul zwischen einem Stellwerk und einem LED-Signalgeber | [2007/02] | English: | Interface Module between a Signal Box and a Signalling Unit with LEDs | [2007/02] | French: | Interface entre un poste d'aiguillage et un signal avec des diodes électroluminescentes | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | LT | 27.02.2008 | LV | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | LU | 04.07.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
LU | 04.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
LU | 04.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
LV | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9512512 (SIEMENS INTEGRA VERKEHRSTECHNI [CH]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19947688 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19948718 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 39; figure . *; | [A]US6392553 (MOLLET SAMUEL R [US], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1324641 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] - [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004075606 (GELCORE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 8 * |