EP1634643 - Doped catalyst on silica-alumina support and improved process for treating hydrocarbon feed streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2011/27] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Euzen, Patrick 14 rue Molière 75001 Paris / FR | 02 /
Chaumonnot, Alexandra 148 bis avenue des Frères Lumière 69008 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Bobin, Carole 18 rue Finale en Emilie 69290 Grézieu La Varenne / FR | 04 /
Bourges, Patrick 114 avenue Lacassagne 69003 Lyon / FR | 05 /
Gueret, Christophe 43 Grande Rue de la Plaine 69560 St Romain en Gal / FR | 06 /
Dulot, Hughes 309 allée des Dragons 91000 Evry / FR | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
Euzen, Patrick 14 rue Molière 75001 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Chaumonnot, Alexandra 148 bis avenue des Frères Lumière 69008 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
Bobin, Carole 5 allée Degas 78160 Marly le Roi / FR | |||
04 /
Bourges, Patrick 114 avenue Lacassagne 69003 Lyon / FR | |||
05 /
Gueret, Christophe 43 Grande Rue de la Plaine 69560 St Romain en Gal / FR | |||
06 /
Dulot, Hughes 309 allée des Dragons 91000 Evry / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291687.1 | 05.08.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | FR20040009546 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: FR 0409546 | [2006/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634643 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634643 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/12, B01J35/10, B01J23/888, C10G47/20 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B01J37/28 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/16 (KR);
B01J23/888 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (US);
B01J35/60 (EP,US);
C10G49/04 (EP,US);
B01J21/02 (EP,US);
B01J2235/05 (EP);
B01J2235/15 (EP);
B01J2235/30 (EP);
B01J23/74 (EP,US);
B01J23/85 (EP,US);
B01J23/883 (EP,US);
B01J23/8877 (EP,US);
B01J23/8885 (EP,US);
B01J23/8993 (EP,US);
B01J27/188 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (EP,US);
B01J37/10 (EP,US);
B01J37/20 (EP,US);
B01J37/30 (EP,US);
C10G2300/107 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dotierter Katalysator auf einem Siliziumoxid-Aluminiumoxid-Träger und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Kohlenwasserstoffeinsätzen | [2006/11] | English: | Doped catalyst on silica-alumina support and improved process for treating hydrocarbon feed streams | [2006/11] | French: | Catalyseur dopé sur support silice-alumine et procédé de traitement de charges hydrocarbonées | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2011 | 15.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4686030 (WARD JOHN W [US]); | [Y]EP0325827 (UNION OIL CO [US]); | [XDY]US5370788 (DAI PEI-SHING E [US], et al); | [Y]US5609750 (NAT PIETER J [NL], et al); | [Y]EP0848992 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [Y]FR2850393 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) | by applicant | US1371808 | US2892858 | US2908635 | FR1261182 | US3124418 | FR1357830 | FR1381282 | US3245919 | US3268295 | US3423332 | US3433747 | US3451947 | US3520654 | US3629152 | US3630670 | US3650988 | US3864461 | US4066574 | US4154812 | EP0015196 | US4313923 | US4371513 | DE3243193 | US4676928 | EP0387109 | US5292426 | US5370788 | WO0001617 | US6030599 | EP1415712 |