EP1755286 - Method and control plane for provisioning connections in a multi-layer transport network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grammel, Gert Meisenweg 3 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Urlichs, Stefan, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Urlichs, Stefan, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05291730.9 | 15.08.2005 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755286 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755286 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04L45/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Steuerungsebene zur Bereitstellung von Verbindungen in einem mehrschichtigen Transportnetz | [2007/08] | English: | Method and control plane for provisioning connections in a multi-layer transport network | [2007/08] | French: | Procédé et plan de contrôle pour l'approvisionnement de connections dans un réseau multicouche de transport | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | BE | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | LT | 12.03.2008 | LV | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | ES | 23.06.2008 | IS | 12.07.2008 | IE | 15.08.2008 | LU | 15.08.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
IE | 15.08.2008 | ||
LU | 15.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
IE | 15.08.2008 | ||
LU | 15.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
IE | 15.08.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
BE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003172362 (MACK-CRANE T BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0040] , [0043] *; | [X] - TOMIC S, "Issues of resource management in two-layer GMPLS networks with virtual network services", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2004. GLOBECOM '04. IEEE DALLAS, TX, USA 29 NOV.-3 DEC., 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041129), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-8794-5, pages 1803 - 1807, XP010757829 [X] 1-11 * page 1804, column L, line 42 - line 52 * * page 1805, column L, line 32 - line 51 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2004.1378295 | [A] - DE MAESSCHALCK S ET AL, "Circuit/wavelength switching and routing report of the achievements of the cost-action 266", TELECOMMUNICATIONS, 2003. CONTEL 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON JUNE 11-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030611), vol. 2, ISBN 953-184-052-0, pages 769 - 773, XP010646991 [A] 1-11 * sections III and V * | by applicant | EP1729457 |