EP1628232 - Information providing system, information providing apparatus, information providing method, portable terminal, information outputting method, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FeliCa Networks, Inc. Gate City Osaki West Tower 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakasa, Shigeki, Felica Networks, Inc. Gate City Osaki W. Tower 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-0032 / JP | 02 /
Ogishima, Jun, Felica Networks, Inc. Gate City Osaki W. Tower 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-0032 / JP | 03 /
Ban, Hiroaki, Felica Networks, Inc. Gate City Osaki W. Tower 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-0032 / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291748.1 | 18.08.2005 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP20040240591 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004240591 | JP20050067983 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005067983 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628232 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1628232 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/50] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informations-Bereitstellungs-System, Informations-Bereitstellungs-Apparat, Informations-Bereitstellungs-Methode, tragbares Endgerät, Informations-Ausgabe-Methode und Computerprogramm | [2006/08] | English: | Information providing system, information providing apparatus, information providing method, portable terminal, information outputting method, and computer program | [2006/08] | French: | Un système pour fournir de l'information, un appareil pour fournir quelques informations, une méthode pour fournir quelques informations, un terminal portatif, une méthode pour produire de l'information, et un programme d'ordinateur | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TOMOYOSHI TAKEBAYASHI, HIROSHI YAMADA, "Approaches to User-Centric Computing System for Ubiquitous Solutions", FUJITSI SCI. TECH. J., Japan, (200312), pages 261 - 269, URL: http://www.fujitsu.com/downloads/MAG/vol39-2/paper15.pdf, (20060104), XP002361508 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - EIJI MURAKAMI, TAKAO TERANO, "Collaborative Filtering for a Distributed Smart IC Card System", Tokyo, Japan, ISSN 6, (2001), pages 183 - 197, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/media/c96e7nrwxpcxn6t7cqwy/contributions/f/a/k/n/faknxc8eah7fjd5t.pdf, (20060104), XP002361509 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44637-0_13 | [A] - ITABASHI T, "Internet based personalized services for public transportation", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), ISBN 0-7803-7954-3, pages 3351 - 3353, XP010701412 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1286303 | [A] - LEI H ET AL, "DataX: an approach to ubiquitous database access", MOBILE COMPUTING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. WMCSA '99. SECOND IEEE WORKSHOP ON NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 25-26 FEB. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990225), ISBN 0-7695-0025-0, pages 70 - 79, XP010323393 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - BJÖRK ET AL, "WEST: a Web Browser for Small Terminals", UIST. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 187 - 196, XP002193373 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/320719.322601 | Examination | - MA WEI-YING ET AL, "Framework for adaptive content delivery in heterogeneous network environments", (20000124), URL: http://www.cooltown.hp.com/papers/adcon/MMCN2000, XP002168331 | by applicant | JP2002259248 | - TAKEBAYSHI ET AL., "Approaches to User-Centric Computing System for Ubiquitous Solutions", FUJITSU SCI. TECH. J., vol. 39, no. 2, pages 261 - 269, XP002361508 |