EP1650745 - Method and computer program for managing barge in a man-machine interface systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states France Telecom S.A. 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paillet, Eric Rue Henri Barbusse, 16 22730 Tregastel / FR | 02 /
Dubois, Dominique Rue du Pont Ile-Grande, 04 22560 Pleumeur-Bodou / FR | 03 /
Merour, Glenn Place des Halles, 01 22300 Lannion / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Saint-Marc-Etienne, Christophe Andréas Orange R&D/PIV/BREVETS 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92794 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Saint-Marc-Etienne, Christophe Andréas FRANCE TELECOM R&D/PIV/BREVETS 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92794 Issy les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291943.8 | 20.09.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | FR20040011093 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0411093 | [2006/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650745 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Computerprogramm zur Verwaltung von Sprachansage-Unterbrechungen einer Mensch-Maschine-Schnittstelle | [2006/17] | English: | Method and computer program for managing barge in a man-machine interface systems | [2006/17] | French: | Procédé et programme d'ordinateur pour gérer une activité de production sonore d'un système d'interaction personne-machine | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003158732 (PI XIAOBO [CN], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,10 * column A; figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] *; | [Y]US2004078201 (PORTER BRANDON W [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,7,8 * column A *; | [XY]US2004098253 (BALENTINE BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column A; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0064] - [0071] * [Y] 3,4,7,8; | [X] - ROSE R C ET AL, "A hybrid barge-in procedure for more reliable turn-taking in human-machine dialog systems", IEEE WORKSHOP ON AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING, 2003. ASRU '03. 2003, ST THOMAS, VI, USA, (20031130), ISBN 0-7803-7980-2, pages 198 - 203, XP010713188 [X] 1,5,6,9 * abstract * * section 2. Existing Barge-in detection methods * * section 4. Hybrid feature/model based detection * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASRU.2003.1318428 |