EP1645196 - Gelified confectionary based on starch and process of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boursier, Bernard 63 route d'Estaires 62138 Violaines / FR | 02 /
Quettier, Claude 82 avenue du Président Kennedy 59130 Lambersart / FR | 03 /
Lesage, Daniel 56 rue Deraedt Wegel 59670 Sainte Marie Cappel / FR | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05291991.7 | 26.09.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | FR20040010488 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0410488 | [2006/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645196 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645196 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0522, A23L1/09, A23G3/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A23G3/34 (EP);
A23G3/42 (EP);
A23L29/219 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Auf Stärke basierte gelatinisierte Süssigkeit und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2006/15] | English: | Gelified confectionary based on starch and process of manufacture thereof | [2006/15] | French: | Confiserie gélifiée à base d'amidon et procédé de préparation d'une telle confiserie | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 05.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08101909.3 / EP2044847 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2009
22.06.2010
WITHDRAWN LAAN, Harry Johan Dijkstrasingel 58 9951 MR Winsum / NL Opponent's representative Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2009
22.06.2010
WITHDRAWN LAAN, Harry Johan Dijkstrasingel 58 9951 MR Winsum / NL Opponent's representative Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2009
23.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE LAAN, Harry Johan Dijkstrasingel 58 9951 MR Winsum / NL Opponent's representative Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2009
23.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE LAAN, Harry Johan Dijkstrasingel 58 9951 MR Winsum / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2009
LAAN, Harry Johan Dijkstrasingel 58 9951 MR Winsum / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | deleted | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.02.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.08.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.08.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | LV | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | LU | 26.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LU | 26.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | BG | 09.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3218177 (ROBINSON JOHN W, et al) [DA] 1-11 * column 1, lines 13-19 * * column 2, lines 7-12,23-26,50-61 * * column 3, lines 19-38 *; | [A]US3446628 (SCHOCH THOMAS J, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 25-49 * * column 3, lines 6-37,56-73 *; | [A]US4225627 (MOORE CARL O) [A] 1-11 * column 3, lines 48-66 ** column 4, lines 58-67 *; | [AD]EP0360046 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [AD] 1-11 * page 3, lines 3-9,31-47 * * page 4, lines 1-6 * * examples I-X *; | [A]US2003031776 (THRESHER WAYNE CARL [NZ]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0015] , [0021] , [0022] , [0026] - [0030] - [0083] , [0094] , [0098] , [0108] , [0115] *; | [A] - RATNAYAKE W S ET AL, "Pea starch: Composition, Structure and Properties - A Review", STARCH STARKE, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (2002), vol. 54, ISSN 0038-9056, pages 217 - 234, XP002269066 [A] 1-11 * page 219, paragraph 6 * * table 1 * * page 229, paragraph 10.7.1.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-379X(200206)54:6<217::AID-STAR217>3.0.CO;2-R |