Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7141744 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2006 | B2 | US2006108139 | 25.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2486814 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1658782 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2007 | B1 | EP1658782 | 31.05.2006 | A3 | EP1658782 | 24.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2486814 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372698T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA2486814 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2486814 | 22.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2486814 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005002439T | 12.06.2008 | T2 | DE602005002439D1 | 25.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA2486814 | 22.11.2004 |