EP1800956 - Device for signal and current transmission between terminal points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nachbauer, Otto Kolpingstrasse 10 92685 Floss / DE | 02 /
Schröer, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. St.-Michael-Strasse 8 92637 Weiden / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05292521.1 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800956 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800956 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H01R35/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B60R16/027 (EP,US);
H01R35/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Signal- bzw. Stromübertragung zwischen Endstellen | [2007/26] | English: | Device for signal and current transmission between terminal points | [2007/26] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de signal et courant entre deux points terminaux | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 04.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | IE | 14.05.2008 | LT | 14.05.2008 | LV | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | IS | 14.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | LU | 25.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | CY | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
TR | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 14.05.2008 | |
LV | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3597721 (MANGAN JOSEPH P) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0556779 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-5 * column 3, line 43 - column 7, line 23; claim - * * column 14, line 16 - column 18, line 2; figures 8,9 * * column 18, line 32 - column 19, line 32; figure 14 *; | [A]US5413492 (OBATA KEN [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001044229 (BUNSELMEIER DIRK [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003094955 (BONN HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2005164524 (KOBER HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0417350 | EP0735631 | EP0556779 |