EP1667415 - Method and system for centralised call transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillard, Michel 1, avenue Louis Georgeon 94230 Cachan / FR | 02 /
Saude, Pierre 11, rue Chanzy 78220 Viroflay / FR | 03 /
Vicendo, Frédéric 94, rue du Général Leclerc 78570 Andresy / FR | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
Guillard, Michel 1, avenue Louis Georgeon 94230 Cachan / FR | ||
02 /
Saude, Pierre 11, rue Chanzy 78220 Viroflay / FR | |||
03 /
Vicendo, Frédéric 94, ruedu Général Leclerc 78570 Andresy / FR | |||
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
Guillard, Michel 1, avenue Louis Georgeon 94230 Cachan / FR | ||
02 /
Saude, Pierre 11, rue Chanzy 78220 Viroflay / FR | |||
03 /
Vicenzo, Frédéric 94, ruedu Général Leclerc 78570 Andresy / FR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/04] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292527.8 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | FR20040012968 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0412968 | [2006/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667415 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667415 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/58 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04M3/58 (EP,US);
H04M3/561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur zentralisierten Anrufübergabe | [2006/23] | English: | Method and system for centralised call transfer | [2006/23] | French: | Procédé et système de transfert d'appels centralisé | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IE | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | LV | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | LU | 29.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CY | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
TR | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
LU | 29.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
LU | 29.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9962274 (SIEMENS INFORMATION COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0076191 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-13* page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 10 *; | [X]US6614897 (CURTIS JONATHAN D [GB], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X] - GELDER VAN J ET AL, "PRIVATE NETWORKING WITH SOPHO-TBX AND SOPHOS SYSTEMS", PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATIE INDUSTRIE N.V. HILVERSUM, NL, (198512), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 237 - 252, XP002032868 [X] 1-13 * paragraphes 6, 6.1*;; figures 6a,6b * |