EP1672002 - Porous composite fillers, process for preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2007/40] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Arkema France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malet, Frédéric 77, rue L. Lecanuet 76000 Rouen / FR | 02 /
Lermat, Yves 6, rue Guy de Maupassant 27300 Bernay / FR | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine, et al Arkema France Propriete Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al Arkema France Propriete Industrielle 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2007/37] | Mouttet, Marie-Paule, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/50] | Mouttet, Marie-Paule, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292624.3 | 09.12.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | FR20040013259 | 14.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413259 | [2006/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672002 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/00, C08L77/00, C08K3/00, C08K3/34, C08K3/36, C08K7/22, C08K7/26, C09C1/30, C09D7/12, C08K9/00 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C08J3/20 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/3072 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Poreuse Kompositfüller, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Anwendung | [2006/25] | English: | Porous composite fillers, process for preparation and use | [2006/25] | French: | Charges poreuses composites, procédé de préparation et utilisation | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 12.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6146762 (D HERBECOURT BRUNO [FR], et al) [X] 9-15 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 48; examples 1-19; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US3421931 (REVERAND AUGUSTE) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 49; examples 1-4; claims 1-16 *; | [A]US3954678 (MARQUISEE MARK JAMES) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - column 5, line 33; examples 1-13; claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO9636668 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 30 - page 7, line 35 * | by applicant | US3954678 | US3421931 | EP0857538 |