Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006134423 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100754267B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2007 | B1 | KR20060067884 | 20.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006168364 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1672002 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0505515 | 12.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2529635 | 14.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1837297 | 27.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2879206 | 23.02.2007 | B1 | FR2879206 | 16.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0413259 | 14.12.2004 |