EP1669280 - Motor vehicle bonnet comprising a rear, integrated cowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delavalle, Dominique 13 rue Louise de Savoie 01160 Pont d'Ain / FR | 02 /
Roux, Jean-Pierre Montée de Bellevue 69480 Pommiers / FR | 03 /
Rocheblave, Laurent 146 avenue Roger Salengro 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05292653.2 | 13.12.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | FR20040013229 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413229 | [2006/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1669280 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/12, B60S1/04 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
B62D25/12 (EP);
B60S1/0463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Motorhaube eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit integrierter hinterer Wasserkastenstruktur | [2006/24] | English: | Motor vehicle bonnet comprising a rear, integrated cowl | [2006/24] | French: | Capot moteur d'un véhicule automobile comportant un auvant arrière intégré | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/49] | 23.07.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001322565 ; | [A]DE4035808 (MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 2 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 16 *; | [A]EP0752363 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 3 * figure 1; claim 2 ** column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 28 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001322565 A 20011120 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPS574474 | GB2268130 | US5277656 |