EP1557502 - Reversible element of solidarisation, panels and arrangements implementing of such elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIMUR Route Nationale 520 38140 SAINT BLAISE LE BUIS / FR | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIOUDE, Yvon Quartier les Fabres 07600, VALS LES BAINS / FR | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2005/30] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05300056.8 | 25.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | FR20040050131 | 26.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0450131 | [2005/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557502 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557502 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557502 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/61, F16B12/60, E04B2/74, E04F13/08, F16B5/00 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
E04F13/0801 (EP);
A47B47/0041 (EP);
A47B96/145 (EP);
E04B2/7401 (EP);
E04B2/7453 (EP);
F16B12/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | E04B1/61, F16B12/60, E04B2/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Umkehrbares Solidarisierungselement, Bretter und Ordnen, die solche Elemente verwirklichen | [2005/30] | English: | Reversible element of solidarisation, panels and arrangements implementing of such elements | [2005/30] | French: | Elément de solidarisation réversible, panneaux et rangements mettant en oeuvre de tels éléments | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IE | 08.04.2009 | LT | 08.04.2009 | PL | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CY | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CY | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 08.04.2009 | |
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | SI | 08.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1337799 (MORRIS SCHLESINGER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 17 - line 25 * * page 1, line 59 - line 109 ** figure - *; | [Y]US4646497 (HOENLE EGON R [US]) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US2003016992 (LAYFIELD DEREK JOHN [AU]) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] * * figures 1,6 * |